Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carl Myers Enterprises, Inc.,, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Baron, Lauren, Mancuso, John Ahmed, Patton, Anna Mae, against Town Of Conesus Zoning Board Of Appeals, represented by Cook, Bridget Ann, O'Toole, Bridget Ann, Zoghlin, Jacob Henry, Zoghlin, Mindy Lee, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 19, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: May 19, 2022MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION)
Date: June 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 11, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Denying Motion for Leave to Reargue |
||
September 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 08, 2023 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
August 31, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 28, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 28, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
June 30, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 22, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Requesting Extension |
||
May 22, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.