Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jill Szawara, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Roach, David Martin, against Carolyn Meisel, Greg Fourst, John Maxwell, Kenneth Book, Michael Dabramo, (total of 7) See All represented by Fitch, David Hogan, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis S Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #01)
Date: September 13, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: January 03, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01) | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #01) *Corrected* | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #01) | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #01) | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMISSION OF SERVICE | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMISSION OF SERVICE | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.