Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Finger Lakes Soaring Club, Inc., filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Dean, Andrew Michael, Dorritie, Megan K, against Holley Smalt, Assessor, Town Of North Dansville, Town Of North Dansville, Town Of North Dansville Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Putney, John C., in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis S Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time106 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 28, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 28, 2019PETITION
Date: August 28, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 28, 2019ORDER - FINAL (Motion #01)
Date: December 11, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #01)
Date: August 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - FINAL (Motion #01) | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #01) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.