Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Joshua L Mauro, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sadinsky, Lisa Ann, against Sarah M Mauro, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with John B Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B Gallagher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
February 04, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
February 02, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
February 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 28, 2021 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
December 31, 2020 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
December 05, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 01, 2020 |
APPENDIX Stipulation to Default |
||
November 30, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 30, 2020 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.