Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas As Indenture Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Saxon Asset Securities Trust 2004-3 Mortgage Loan Asset Backed Notes, Series 2004-3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Austin Carter A K A Austin C. Carter, Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, Denise C. Carter A K A Denise Treuthart, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property, Described In The Complaint, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 |
ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE Transferring Case to Master Calendar |
||
July 12, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 12, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
June 28, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Foreclosure Settlement Conference Notice |
||
June 21, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for Settlement Conference |
||
November 23, 2021 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI |
||
November 23, 2021 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AUSTIN CARTER |
||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AUSTIN CARTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.