Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of New York Mortgage Agency, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Mullen, Richard S, against John Doe, Katherine L. Mattison A K A Katherine Mattison, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis S Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01)
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #01)
Date: November 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #01) dmb 20191908 |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #01) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Filed by MXT - 20191908 |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #01) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01) | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.