Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lynn M Burdick, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Duke, Susan Kathleen, against Randy G Burdick, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with John B Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B Gallagher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 16, 2021 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 13, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 02, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 01, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 17, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 17, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 16, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
August 16, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.