Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reliant Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Julie L Mead, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas E Moran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas E Moran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
November 08, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 04, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT non expiration SOL |
||
November 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT aff of mailing |
||
November 04, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.