We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Lvnv Funding Llc V. Bethann Bruette

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago

Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Bethann Bruette, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Courtwith Robert B Wiggins presiding.

Case Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

June 25, 2019

Category

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff

Last Refreshed

December 23, 2022

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Livingston County, NY

Matter Type

Consumer Debt

Verdict

Unclassified

Filing Court House

Livingston County Supreme Court

Matter Type

Disposed

Case Cycle Time

15 days

Case Documents

JUDGMENT

Date: August 29, 2022

DEFECT CHECKLIST

Date: July 21, 2022

DEFECT CHECKLIST

Date: January 06, 2022

Case Events

Type Description
JUDGMENT
DEFECT CHECKLIST
DEFECT CHECKLIST
AFFIRMATION
AFFIDAVIT
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Docket Event AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Docket Event STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Docket Event SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
See all events