Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Pamela J. Carrington For An Order Cancelling Of Record A Mortgage Pursuant To New York Real Property Law Section 329, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Johnston, Brian Matthew, against N A, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Discharge A Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 03, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2016NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 22, 2016ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 22, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 05, 2016ORDER - FINAL Â (Motion #01)
Date: September 08, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 22, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 22, 2016PETITION
Date: July 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2016 |
ORDER - FINAL (Motion #01) Signed Order Cancelling a Mortgage of Record |
||
September 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Cohen Hearing Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
September 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Cohen (Court Activity) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
September 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Cohen (Motion Part) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
September 07, 2016 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) Cohen (Motion Part) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
August 05, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LIVINGSTON COUNTY CLERK |
||
August 03, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 03, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE AMENITIES CORP. |
||
July 25, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 09/07/2016Decided Before Justice: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
July 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Cohen (Motion Part) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.