Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam M, Hughes, Adam Michael, against Lindley M Chapman, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time225 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 28, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 05, 2019STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
December 08, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.