Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Carolynn Vales, represented by Borgese, Frank Junior, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: August 27, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 07, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 11, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
February 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
January 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 26, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE default letter |
||
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.