Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Timothy Collmer, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Robert B Wiggins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert B Wiggins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions209 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time215 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 09, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
December 04, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
December 04, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 04, 2019 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 04, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
December 04, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
December 04, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
December 04, 2019 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Wiggins (Court Activity)
Judge: Wiggins, Hon. Robert B. |
|
May 17, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.