Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Conchita C Ralston, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis S Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 14, 2019NOTICE
Date: August 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Administrative review to the court |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
|
June 01, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
June 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.