Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Daniel G Knights, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 08, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time148 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: July 26, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFECT CHECKLIST | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.