Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Melissa Savino, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis S Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time130 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 28, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: August 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 03, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL | ||
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.