Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lewis, Kenneth Michael, Shur, Joseph M, against David Fanaro, Lakeview Construction, Llc, represented by Gaglione, Gregory Scott, Graber, James Jude, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action with Prejudice |
||
May 04, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
March 01, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Corp. |
||
February 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
February 22, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
February 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
January 21, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
January 21, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.