Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mary Ellen Burr, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rudderow, Michelle A., against Abc Entities 1-5, Gerard Crawford Md, John And Or Jane Doe, Kelly Birchenough Do, Lewis County General Hospital, (total of 6) See All represented by Kelly, Sarah Murnane, Mattison, Zachary Martin, Schoonmaker, Cory John, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with William Ramseier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam Ramseier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART)
Date: July 10, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 18, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 16, 2023ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 12, 2023SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 12, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART) | ||
April 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 19, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Memorandum Decision and Order |
||
February 16, 2023 |
ANSWER of Kelly Birchenough, D.O. |
||
January 30, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) Motion adjourned to 3/16/23 at 10:30 a.m. |
||
January 24, 2023 | ORDER - TRANSFER | ||
January 19, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) of Kerry Herbine |
||
January 18, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) of Sarah Murnane Kelly, Esq. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.