Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sjf Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Genung, Elizabeth A, Levine, Louis, against Taylor L. Laparr, Timothy D. Laparr, represented by Matteson, Adam Roy, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 12, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 12, 2022SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
July 15, 2022 |
SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Letter rejecting Defendants' Answer |
||
July 13, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
July 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A contract |
||
July 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT 3215 D2 |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT non military D1 |
||
July 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B military Search D1 |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT non military D2 |
||
July 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.