Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Dawn M Pelo, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 03, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 03, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: August 03, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
August 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE R&R FILE # 1406777 |
||
August 03, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1406777 |
||
August 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1406777 |
||
August 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1406777 |
||
August 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 NOTICE OF DEFAULT R&R FILE # 1406777 |
||
August 03, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT R&R FILE # 1406777 |
||
September 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.