Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Samantha Renee Snyder, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Brotherton, Justin Frederick, against Patrick Justin Snyder, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C. Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C. Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Hearing |
POST-SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL MERRELL (Court Activity) Held Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
September 21, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
September 20, 2021 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 20, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 13, 2021 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MERRELL (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
August 27, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
August 27, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED MERRELL (Court Activity) Held Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
August 27, 2021 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE AND FINDIN (Motion #001) Decided: 09/20/2021GRANTED Before Justice: CHARLES C. MERRELL Answer demanded: No Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
August 27, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.