Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Berkshire Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Arthur R Bell, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2020RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 26, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 26, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 29, 2021 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
February 26, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
February 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
February 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) | ||
February 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military search |
||
February 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) non military |
||
February 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
February 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.