Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lisa A Steiner, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Young, Lydia Lea, against Joseph J Steiner, represented by Weldon, Robert Michael, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management212 days |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 09, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
May 26, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 24, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
November 01, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 12, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
February 09, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
February 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
January 26, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
January 21, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.