Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Orson P Yancey, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bennett, Teresa Marie, against Lyndaker Excavating & Trucking Llc, Paul H Lyndaker, represented by Ward, Matthew Earl, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with James P. Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management196 days |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Case Cycle Time261 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of Lewis County, New York. The plaintiff, Orson P. Yancey, is suing Paul H. Lyndaker and Lyndaker Excavating & Trucking LLC as defendants. The complaint alleges that the defendants default...
JUDGMENT
Date: May 08, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 24, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: May 08, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 24, 2019ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 07, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 07, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 30, 2019COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 24, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2019COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 03, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2019AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2019ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 07, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2018ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Amendment to Commercial Security Agreement dated 4/4/15
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 07, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2018ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 08, 2019 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment |
||
May 07, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment w/Notice of Entry |
||
May 07, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Decision with Notice of Entry |
||
April 30, 2019 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
April 30, 2019 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) | ||
April 25, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JAMES P. MCCLUSKY |
|
April 24, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) In Support of An Award of Attorneys' Fees |
||
April 24, 2019 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) | ||
April 22, 2019 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.