Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Flat Rock Windpower Ii Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Nye, Jonathan Phillips, against Copenhagen Central School District, County Of Lewis, Lowville Academy And Central School District, Lowville Town Of Board Of Assessment Review, South Lewis Central School District, (total of 9) See All represented by D'Imperio, Dominic Scott, Mcnichol, Joan E, Williams, Ted Henry, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management136 days |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 08, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: June 18, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
May 15, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 11, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED MERRELL (Court Activity) Held Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
May 11, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
May 08, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 01, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
November 20, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MERRELL (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
November 20, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
August 27, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MERRELL (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
July 16, 2019 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.