Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roth, Gerald C, against Amber M Bishop, John Doe #1 Through And Including John Doe#25, Jonathan Q Bishop, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions373 days |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time455 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 23, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Referee Report of Sale | ||
December 30, 2019 |
FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM Fully Executed FC Surplus |
||
November 14, 2019 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
October 29, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
October 23, 2019 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
October 22, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 05, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
August 02, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #2) 1306 STATEMENT OF FILING |
||
August 02, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.