Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Five Star Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hooks, Robert D, Mcandrew, John Kevin, against Charles H Jr Matthews, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time72 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 26, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: September 18, 2018JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: September 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 26, 2018AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: September 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 18, 2018EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 18, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 31, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2018 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 26, 2018 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees |
||
September 26, 2018 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
September 26, 2018 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of additional mailing |
||
September 26, 2018 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of investigator and military pull |
||
September 26, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 25, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 25, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 18, 2018 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 18, 2018 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.