Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First Pioneer Farm Credit Aca, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Griffith, Kelly C., against A & M Tabolt Farms A K A, Christine A Tabolt, Martha Sullivan, Michael A A K A Tabolt A K A Michael Tabolt, Individually And D B A A & M Tabolt Farms A K A A & M Tabolt, & M Tabolt A, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time361 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to court advising Plaintiff paid in full and stipulations to discontinue action and cancel no Letter to court advising Plaintiff paid in full and stipulations to discontinue action and cancel no ... show more |
||
July 09, 2019 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 09, 2019 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
July 09, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation pursuant to CPLR 6514(d) |
||
July 09, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES P. MCCLUSKY |
|
July 09, 2019 | Motion |
STIPULATAION DISCONTINUING ACT (Motion #002) Decided: 07/09/2019CASE CLOSED Before Justice: HON. JAMES P. MCCLUSKY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JAMES P. MCCLUSKY |
|
July 09, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES P. MCCLUSKY |
|
July 09, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES P. MCCLUSKY |
|
June 03, 2019 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting an additional 6 weeks to complete the transactions |
||
May 08, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.