Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Marianne Dunn, represented by Caruso, Jessica Ann, Francisco-Lau, Erica Maysan, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions286 days |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 04, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: April 03, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
December 18, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 07, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
April 03, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 03, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
April 03, 2019 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
April 03, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 03, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION |
||
February 06, 2019 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 05, 2019 | DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.