Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Master Participation Trust Lsf10, Us Bank Trust Na As Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cohn, Michael Holliday, against James A Tabolt, New York State Department Of Labor O B O O B O The People Of The State Of New York, People Of The State Of New York Described In The Verified Complaint, represented by Whelan, Terrence John, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time598 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 23, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 12, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2019 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
October 25, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
October 17, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 25, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED: LOAN MODIFICATION MERRELL (Settlement Conference) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 23, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) with Affidavit of Service |
||
September 23, 2019 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 23, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Proposed Order |
||
September 23, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 23, 2019 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION & VACATE NO (Motion #001) Decided: 10/23/2019GRANTED Before Justice: CHARLES C. MERRELL Answer demanded: No Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.