Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Rome Aka Rome City Of, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Browne, Erika C, Goldman, Paul J, against Board Of Assessment Review, Town Of Lewis Aka Lewis Town Of, Town Of Lewis Assessor Aka Lewis Town Assessor, represented by Mcnichol, Joan E, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 22, 2018 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT VERIFIED STATEMENT |
||
January 22, 2018 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
January 02, 2018 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
January 02, 2018 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
October 13, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
October 13, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
September 29, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT VERIFIED ANSWER |
||
September 22, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
September 21, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT VERIFIED ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.