Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C. Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C. Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time241 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
October 31, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
October 18, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 25, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 25, 2018 | Motion |
ORDER CONFIRMING REFEREE REPOR (Motion #002) Decided: 10/31/2018GRANTED Before Justice: CHARLES C. MERRELL Answer demanded: No Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
April 13, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
March 15, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
March 05, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
March 05, 2018 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STRIKING DEF (Motion #001) Decided: 04/13/2018GRANTED; MOSEMAN APPOINTED REF Before Justice: CHARLES C. MERRELL Answer demanded: No Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.