Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lenny Swandayati, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Gonzalez, Francisco, against New York City Transit Authority, represented by Reid-Green, Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Rosemarie Montalbano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRosemarie Montalbano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2014 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Prem Liability - Falldown) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 02, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Hearing | Note Of Issue/City, No Apps | |
April 07, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Note of Issue- Attorney Affirmation |
||
April 07, 2021 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue w/Jury Demand |
||
April 02, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Execution of Deposition Transcript and Deposition Minutes of Syed Islam |
||
April 02, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post Deposition Notice for Discovery & Inspection Dated April 2, 2021 |
||
December 21, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER mot seq 2 dated 12/16/2020 |
||
December 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted to the Extent of the Order (Motion #002) CITY 22 Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
December 16, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #002) CITY DISCOVERY MOTION Judge: CITY DISCOVERY PART 22 |
|
December 15, 2020 |
STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Short Form Order Resolving Motion #2 |
||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.