Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bernice Ulto, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Harrison, Mariselle Rose, Miller, Kara Kimberly Kathan, Black, Andrew Seth, against Gregory Ulto, represented by Moore, Benjamin Donly Thomas, Sakofsky, Lauren J, Pandolfo, Gregory, Richman, Keith H, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Cheryl J. Gonzales presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCheryl J. Gonzales Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 29, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | ||
January 20, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - 1 | ||
January 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 20, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 19, 2022 | BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
December 12, 2022 | TRIAL DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.