Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Mohammed Alomeri, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by D'Agostino, Lisa Anne, Klirsfeld, Lucas B, against Yaisrah Alomeri, represented by Green, Elliot, Guinn, Nathaniel William, Katz, Joshua Reuven, Mastrodomenico, Donald, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Theresa M. Ciccotto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheresa M. Ciccotto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
February 14, 2022 |
ORDER - INTERIM Sensitive |
||
February 14, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Sensitive |
||
January 13, 2022 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
January 12, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 07, 2022 | ORDER - AMENDED | ||
January 04, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 03, 2022 | ORDER - INTERIM | ||
January 03, 2022 | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY FOR THE CHILD(REN) UCS880 | ||
January 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.