Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
S W By His Father And Natural Guardian Shlomo Wiesner, filed a(n) Torts - Product Liability (Bicycle) case represented by Leitner, Kenneth Adam, Tolchin, Robert Joseph, against Accell Group, N.V., Accell North America, Inc., Albert Weber D B A Webers Bicycles & Sewing Machines, Regent, L.P. D B A Diamondback, represented by Campbell, Youngmin Oh, Keenoy, Christopher Patrick, Linefsky, Miles Alexander, Miller, Jeffrey Todd, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIngrid Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Product Liability (Bicycle) |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 22, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 19, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 19, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 19, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 20, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1)
Date: February 02, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 02, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: May 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 26, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 03, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 03, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2)
Date: May 09, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2)
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2)
Date: May 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 21, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 23, 2023STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 26, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 24, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected* Stipulation Discontinuing Action Against Regent, L.P. Only (Case Remains Active) |
||
July 21, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed CCP Order - Consent |
||
July 21, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
May 26, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 23, 2023 |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Verified Reply to Accell's Cross-Claim |
||
May 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
May 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.