Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Liaqat Khan, Mussawar Liaqat, Nablia Haider, Nasreen Bibi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Feinberg, Steven Michael, against D & E Realty Co Llc, Fadila Kurshumlija, Moses Eckstein, represented by Ershowsky, Michael Brian, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Sheares Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 14, 2023 |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) certificate of readiness for trial |
||
February 09, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Defendant Reply Affidavit |
||
February 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Notice |
||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Defendant Reply Affidavit (signed) |
||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Attorney Reply Affirmation |
||
January 26, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION | ||
January 26, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.