Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Michele Carlo, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Digrazia, Joseph Nicholas, against Elisa Debellis Seeger, Robert Seeger Jr, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Miller, Laura Jeanne Ciotti, Sommers, John Gerard, Spellman, Kevin M, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kings Cdp25 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp25 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 1/30/23 |
||
December 12, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) DoT Hardship Affidavit |
||
June 13, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
June 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Preliminary Conference Order |
||
June 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
June 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) summons and Complaint |
||
June 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Seeger Answer |
||
June 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) City of NY Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.