Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Beverley Marchionda, Thomas J Franco, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Suris, Raymond Joseph, against Audrey B Meza, Community Care Ems, Llc, Lifeline Ambulance Service, Inc, represented by Schwartz, Bryan T., Weg, Jeremy Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Carl J Landicino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarl J Landicino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Suggestion of Restraint - Park Ins. Liquidation |
||
November 01, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated October 25, 2022 |
||
April 20, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 15, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 10, 2021 |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint |
||
November 24, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Executed Stipulation Extending Defendants Time to Answer |
||
November 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Def Community Care EMS |
||
October 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Def. Lifeline Ambulance Service Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.