Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Julie Lockett, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Campisi, Joseph, against Richard A. Desouza, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Kings Cdp7 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp7 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 20, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: March 28, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 26, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 13, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 26, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 26, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 26, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Pltfs BP Response |
||
September 26, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Pltfs Demand for BP as to Affirmative Defenses |
||
September 26, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Pltfs Notice of D&I and Combined Demands |
||
September 26, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Pltfs Response to Defts Combined Demands |
||
September 26, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
September 26, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 28, 2022 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) amended answer |
||
October 13, 2021 | answer with combined demands | ||
September 16, 2021 | Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.