Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rudolph Bentley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davydov, Denis David, Ladnik, Stanislav Igorevich, against Kuljit Singh, represented by Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Carl J Landicino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarl J Landicino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 30, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
August 24, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to change attorney |
||
August 03, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 7/28/22 |
||
July 28, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Compliance Conference Order |
||
February 01, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 20, 2021 | Preliminary Conference request | ||
December 20, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 06, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.