Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nilufar Nasrieva, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gerdes, Jennifer Maria, Viener, Joseph B, against Taragee Construction Corp., Zain Sajjad Khawaja, represented by Gradowitz, Sean Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Carolyn E Wade presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn E Wade Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
July 27, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Withdrawal of Consolidation Motion |
||
June 29, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) third party def's motion |
||
June 29, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
June 29, 2023 |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #4) me too motion to dismiss |
||
June 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Aff of service |
||
June 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) S&C and 3rd Pty S&C |
||
June 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Khawaja and Targee answer |
||
June 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) 3rd Pty Deft Answer |
||
June 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Notice of Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.