Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jean Almonte-Moreno, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grossman, Jack, Pomara, Francesco, Tasso, Lorenzo, against Jose Tevez, Jude E Keita, Vivian Keita, represented by Bevolas, Leo George, Rani, Sudesh, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter P. Sweeney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 23, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 03, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 21, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 16, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 03, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 25, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 16, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 15, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip |
||
May 03, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip |
||
May 01, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 03, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
February 03, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 03, 2023 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE |
||
February 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.