Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
W. B., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sandler, Jason Samuel, Schmitt, Cali Fay, against Diocese Of Brooklyn, Holy Family Church, represented by Germaine, Christopher Steven, Ortiz, Robert, Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Laurence L. Love presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurence L. Love Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2020SUMMONS
Date: September 23, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
December 09, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 12/8/22 |
||
December 07, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 15, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT First Compliance Conference Stipulation and Order (Proposed) |
||
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Order Concerning Liaison Counsel for NYC - Hon. George J. Silver |
||
April 05, 2021 |
ORDER - AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.