Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Kimberley Aldridge, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Cate, Elizabeth Aleen, Hiller, Elizabeth Anne Klein, Storey, Devin Miles, Zalkin, Irwin Myron, against Henrietta Congregation Of Jehovah'S Witnesses, John And Jane Does 1-100, Lawrence Savino, The Governing Body Of Jehovah'S Witnesses, Watchtower Bible And Tract Society Of New York, (total of 5) See All represented by Korgul, Margaret Tamara, La Rocco, Anthony P., Parker, Dana, Schaerf, Carl Judah, Welch, Eugene, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Sabrina Kraus presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSabrina Kraus Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Kimberley Aldridge, is suing the defendants, which include the Governing Body of Jehovah's Witnesses, the Henrietta Congregation o...
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Defendant Lawrence Savino |
||
November 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 30, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Love Extending 45-day Stay Pursuant to CMO #1 |
||
May 15, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Notifying Court of 45-Day Stay Pursuant to CMO #1 |
||
April 17, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter re: First Compliance Conference Order Notice |
||
March 19, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Compliance Conference Order Timeline |
||
January 25, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Watchtower, Governing Body and Henrietta Congregation |
||
December 19, 2022 | Notice of Entry | ||
December 09, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) to sever, dismiss and amend...dtd 12/7/22 |
||
October 13, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.