Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hakeem Bradley, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rickner, Robert H, against Daniel Pagan, Kenneth J. Dwyer, The City Of New York, represented by , Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Gina Abadi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGina Abadi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Civil Rights) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 23, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
April 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 22, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 22, 2021 | Hearing |
CITY 7
Judge: Montalbano, Hon. Rosemarie |
|
February 22, 2021 | Hearing |
CITY DISC. PRELIMIARY CONF
Judge: ROSEMARIE MONTALBANO, PT 7 |
|
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
November 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned CITY 7 Judge: Montalbano, Hon. Rosemarie |
|
November 30, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CITY DISC. PRELIMIARY CONF Judge: ROSEMARIE MONTALBANO, PT 7 |
|
November 23, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
October 01, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Officers Dwyer and Pagan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.