Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jcf Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Georgoulis, Chris, Ioannidi, Eirini, Kelton, Justin Tyler, Lainas, James G., Lucas, Paul Victor, (total of 6) See All against Take Two Outdoor Media Llc, represented by Cutaia, Nicholas, Grodin, Jaclyn Hillary, Pruzan, Peter J., Weintraub, Evan Scott, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Joy Campanelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoy Campanelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Ejectmnet) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 26, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL JCF Notice of Appeal w Order with Notice of Entry; and Informational Statement |
||
March 16, 2023 |
DECISION AFTER TRIAL Order dated 3/16/23 |
||
March 16, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 16, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 30, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #7) Notice of Entry |
||
January 30, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #7) Order dated 1/30/23 |
||
January 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Excerpt from Expert Deposition Testimony of Fred Marziano (Illinois Nat. Ins. Co. v. Wyhndam Worldwi Excerpt from Expert Deposition Testimony of Fred Marziano (Illinois Nat. Ins. Co. v. Wyhndam Worldwi ... show more |
||
January 24, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #7) Reply Affirmation of Evan Weintraub, Esq. in Further Support of Defendants' Motion |
||
January 23, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 23, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.