Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jael Tusa Quinga, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bellin, Eugene Mark, against Britneytusa Quinga As Administrator Of The Estate Of Leonel G Tusa Masaquiza, Deceased, Ftl 1001, Llc, Paudy A. Nunez-Arias, Rigo Limo-Auto Corp., The Estate Of Leonel G Tusa Masaquiza, Deceased, (total of 5) See All represented by Hellreich, Steven Mark, Lachman, Michael, Moskovits, Ronit Z, Weber, Andrew Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Sheares Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Note of Issue |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Order |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Bill of Particulars Bill of Particulars Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Answer |
||
September 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
September 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Defendant's Deposition |
||
September 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Plaintiff's Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.