Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
N. L., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Harriman, Lindsey Violet, Seiden, Jesse Ariel, against Bethel Seventh-Day Adventist Church,, General Conference Of Seventh-Day Adventists, New York Conference Of Seventh-Day Adventists, represented by Facciponte, Giancarlo, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Alexander M. Tisch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlexander M. Tisch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 14, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 |
NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) (Motion #2) Notice to Co Clerk, NOE, Decision and Order |
||
August 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 19, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Compliance Conference Order Timeline |
||
March 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 27, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 12, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
August 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) S&C&OSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.