Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Melvin Blum, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Breakstone, Samantha Allyne, Leder, Linc, Slater, Joseph M, against City Of New York, The New York City Department Of Education F K A New York City Board Of Education, The New York City Department Of Education F K A New York City Board Of Education, represented by , in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge J. Silver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 15, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: July 10, 2022ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
February 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance for Samantha Breakstone |
||
August 16, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Defs. NYC Board/Department of Education's and the City of New York's Notice of Examination Before Tr Defs. NYC Board/Department of Education's and the City of New York's Notice of Examination Before Tr ... show more |
||
August 16, 2021 |
ANSWER Defs. NYC Board/Department of Education's and the City of New York's verified answer, dated August 1 Defs. NYC Board/Department of Education's and the City of New York's verified answer, dated August 1 ... show more |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
June 15, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J. Silver (Directing Master Index Number) |
||
June 15, 2021 |
ORDER - AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver |
||
June 14, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver |
||
June 14, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: Hon. George J. Silver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.